Ian Smales - Teams Played Against
Team | Games | Tries | Goals | DropGoals | Points | First Game Against | Last Game Against |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Canterbury Select | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 13 Jun 1990 | 13 Jun 1990 |
Dewsbury Rams | 3 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 01 Jun 1997 | 19 Jul 1998 |
Ellenborough | 1 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 15 Feb 1998 | 15 Feb 1998 |
Featherstone Rovers | 3 | 2 | 0 | 0 | 8 | 22 Mar 1998 | 14 Aug 1998 |
Halifax Panthers | 2 | 2 | 0 | 0 | 8 | 09 Apr 1996 | 30 Jun 1996 |
Huddersfield Giants | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 22 Jun 1997 | 22 Jun 1997 |
Hull Kingston Rovers | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 26 May 1997 | 24 Jun 1998 |
Islands Zone | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 30 May 1990 | 30 May 1990 |
Keighley Cougars | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 29 Mar 1998 | 28 Jun 1998 |
Kiwi Colts | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 20 Jun 1990 | 20 Jun 1990 |
Lancashire | 1 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 18 Sep 1991 | 18 Sep 1991 |
Leeds Rhinos | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 05 Apr 1996 | 05 Apr 1996 |
Leigh Leopards | 3 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 01 Mar 1998 | 05 Jul 1998 |
London Broncos | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 25 Aug 1996 | 25 Aug 1996 |
Northern/Highlands Zones | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 23 May 1990 | 23 May 1990 |
Oldham | 2 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 20 Apr 1996 | 14 Jul 1996 |
Paris Saint-Germain | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 17 Aug 1996 | 17 Aug 1996 |
Rochdale Hornets | 3 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 08 Feb 1998 | 12 Jul 1998 |
Salford Red Devils | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 09 Feb 1997 | 16 Mar 1997 |
Sheffield Eagles | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 03 May 1996 | 21 Jul 1996 |
Skirlaugh | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 01 Feb 1998 | 01 Feb 1998 |
Southern Zone | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 20 May 1990 | 20 May 1990 |
St. Helens | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 04 Feb 1996 | 02 Aug 1996 |
Swinton Lions | 3 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 15 Mar 1998 | 02 Aug 1998 |
Taranaki Invitation | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 04 Jul 1990 | 04 Jul 1990 |
Wakefield Trinity | 3 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 08 Jun 1997 | 26 Jul 1998 |
Warrington Wolves | 3 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 10 Aug 1996 | 25 Aug 1997 |
Wellington | 1 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 27 Jun 1990 | 27 Jun 1990 |
Whitehaven | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 05 Apr 1998 | 15 Jul 1998 |
Widnes Vikings | 3 | 1 | 1 | 0 | 6 | 08 Mar 1998 | 07 Aug 1998 |
Wigan Warriors | 3 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 14 Apr 1996 | 23 Mar 1997 |
Workington Town | 1 | 2 | 0 | 0 | 8 | 28 Jul 1996 | 28 Jul 1996 |